TN HB1193 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from 1.125 percent to 0.5 percent the percentage the department of revenue keeps from the proceeds from the local option sales tax to defray the state's expenses in administering, collecting, and remitting local sales taxes. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, reduces from 1.125 percent to 0.5 percent the percentage the department of revenue keeps from the proceeds from the local option sales tax to defray the state's expenses in administering, collecting, and remitting local sales taxes. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Wright [R] | Rep. Justin Lafferty [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1126 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee