TN HB1192 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 450
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 450
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department of education and public schools to commemorate the centennial of women's suffrage and recognize the Tennesseans who were instrumental in securing all women the right to vote for the purpose of educating students about the ratification of the nineteenth amendment to the United States Constitution on August 18, 1920, and to educate students on the state of Tennessee's fundamental role in guaranteeing all women the right to vote. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-1028.
Title
As enacted, requires the department of education and public schools to commemorate the centennial of women's suffrage and recognize the Tennesseans who were instrumental in securing all women the right to vote for the purpose of educating students about the ratification of the nineteenth amendment to the United States Constitution on August 18, 1920, and to educate students on the state of Tennessee's fundamental role in guaranteeing all women the right to vote. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-1028.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 450 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/22/2019 | |
2019-05-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-15 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-07 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0391) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0370) |
2019-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass. ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Ref. to Education |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1248 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 450