TN HB1191 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the effective date of a commercial risk insurance policy cancellation from 10 days to 15 days after notice is mailed to a named insured. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, extends the effective date of a commercial risk insurance policy cancellation from 10 days to 15 days after notice is mailed to a named insured. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee |
2020-02-25 | House | Ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1033 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-02 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 12/1/2020