TN HB1191 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a person who records cruelty to animals as committed against livestock to report such violation and submit any unedited photographs or video recordings to law enforcement authorities within 24 hours of the photograph's or recording’s creation. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 44.
Title
As introduced, requires a person who records cruelty to animals as committed against livestock to report such violation and submit any unedited photographs or video recordings to law enforcement authorities within 24 hours of the photograph's or recording’s creation. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 44.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Agriculture and Natural Resourc (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Agriculture and Natural Resourc (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2013-04-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2013 |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/16/2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/13/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/13/2013 |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/6/2013 |
2013-02-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2013-02-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-13 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1248 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-13 - Vetoed by Governor