TN HB1190 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 449
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 449
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows real property conveyances to a trust to vest title in the trustee of the trust; requires that public records referencing a trust be indexed by the name of the trust, if stated in the document, and in the name of each trustee listed in the document. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 35 and Title 66.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 35 and Title 66, relative to real property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 449 | |
2021-04-29 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/29/21 |
2021-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-21 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/29/2021 |
2021-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0881 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021