TN HB1186 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 420
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, makes various changes to laws regarding trusts. - Amends TCA Title 35.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 35, relative to trusts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19 Pub. Ch. 420
2021-05-19 Effective date(s) 07/01/2021; 01/01/2022
2021-05-12 Signed by Governor.
2021-05-05HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-05-04SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-03HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-03HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-04-29SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2021-04-29SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0373)
2021-04-29SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-04-15SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2021-04-14HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-04-14HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1
2021-04-14HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0121)
2021-04-08HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2021
2021-04-07HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021
2021-04-06HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-31HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/6/2021
2021-03-31HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/31/2021
2021-03-24HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-03-24HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-17HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/24/2021
2021-03-17HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2021-03-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/17/2021
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee
2021-02-24HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2021-02-22HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-10HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0896 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 420

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback