TN HB1186 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises the penalties for theft of property. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Section 40-32-101.
Title
As introduced, revises the penalties for theft of property. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Section 40-32-101.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-28 | House | Reassigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-01-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-28 | House | Meeting Canceled Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/04/2020 |
2020-01-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 1/28/2020 |
2019-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2020 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0656 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee