TN HB1182 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Debt Resolution Services Act." - Amends TCA Title 47.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Debt Resolution Services Act." - Amends TCA Title 47.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/19
2019-04-04HouseReset on cal. for 4/11/19
2019-03-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/19
2019-03-28HouseReset on next avail. cal.
2019-03-21HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2019
2019-03-19HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Banking & Investments Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Banking & Investments Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1013 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Reset on cal. for First Calendar of 2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback