TN HB1182 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Failed in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Failed in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a candidate for president of the United States to file with the secretary of state tax returns for the immediately preceding five years as a prerequisite for being placed on a primary or general election ballot; requires the secretary of state to give notice of the prerequisite to each qualified candidate. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, requires a candidate for president of the United States to file with the secretary of state tax returns for the immediately preceding five years as a prerequisite for being placed on a primary or general election ballot; requires the secretary of state to give notice of the prerequisite to each qualified candidate. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | Failed in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0588 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-09 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee