TN HB1181 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to Premier Type Tourist Resort Calendar
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to Premier Type Tourist Resort Calendar
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates Legacy Farms in Lebanon as a premier type tourist resort for purposes of consuming alcoholic beverages on the premises - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Title
As introduced, designates Legacy Farms in Lebanon as a premier type tourist resort for purposes of consuming alcoholic beverages on the premises - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Sponsors
Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to Premier Type Tourist Resort Calendar |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1421 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-14 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.