TN HB1176 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, reduces the penalty for the offense of carrying a handgun without a permit and with the intent to go armed to a Class C misdemeanor with a $25 fine for a first offense or $50 for a second or subsequent offense and requires a citation to be issued in lieu of arrest. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, reduces the penalty for the offense of carrying a handgun without a permit and with the intent to go armed to a Class C misdemeanor with a $25 fine for a first offense or $50 for a second or subsequent offense and requires a citation to be issued in lieu of arrest. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Title 40.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-04-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017
2017-04-12HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-04-11HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-04-05HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/12/2017
2017-04-05HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2017-03-29HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
2017-03-29HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 4/5/2017
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-03-22HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/29/2017
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
2017-03-15HouseMeeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/22/17
2017-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/15/2017
2017-02-15HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2017-02-15HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2017-02-13HouseP1C.
2017-02-09HouseIntro.
2017-02-09HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0339 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-18 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee / no second

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback