TN HB1175 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 45-7)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 658
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 45-7)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 658
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the bureau of TennCare to reimburse an ambulance service provider that provides a covered service to a TennCare recipient at a rate not less than 67.5 percent of the federal medicare program's allowable charge for participating providers; requires the bureau to seek an intergovernmental transfer of funds for the sole purpose of increasing the rate of reimbursement to ambulance service providers that provide covered services to TennCare recipients at a rate greater than 67.5 percent of the federal medicare program's allowable charge for participating providers. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, requires the bureau of TennCare to reimburse an ambulance service provider that provides a covered service to a TennCare recipient at a rate not less than 67.5 percent of the federal medicare program's allowable charge for participating providers; requires the bureau to seek an intergovernmental transfer of funds for the sole purpose of increasing the rate of reimbursement to ambulance service providers that provide covered services to TennCare recipients at a rate greater than 67.5 percent of the federal medicare program's allowable charge for participating providers. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Pub. Ch. 658 | |
2020-04-06 | Effective date(s) 04/03/2020 | |
2020-04-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2020-03-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0360) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0662) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-03-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-03-19 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-03-19 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 4 - HA0692) |
2020-03-19 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0689) |
2020-03-19 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0684) |
2020-03-19 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0517) |
2020-03-19 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Action def. to Next Calendar in Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 2/11/2020 |
2019-04-15 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Insurance Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Assigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1469 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 658