TN HB1175 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each state agency head to complete periodic training for purposes of complying with the requirements of the "Regulatory Flexibility Act of 2007." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, requires each state agency head to complete periodic training for purposes of complying with the requirements of the "Regulatory Flexibility Act of 2007." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0446 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee