TN HB1173 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Failed in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires an insurer to provide the names of the beneficiaries of a decedent's life insurance policy, the benefit amount under the policy, and other information requested by a funeral director or funeral establishment that contacts the insurer on behalf of the decedent's family. - Amends TCA Title 35; Title 56 and Title 62, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 35; Title 56 and Title 62, Chapter 5, relative to life insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21HouseFailed in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
2023-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/21/2023
2023-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Insurance Subcommittee to 3/21/2023
2023-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/14/2023
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1197 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-10 - Re-refer to S. Cal Comm

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback