TN HB1173 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Local Education Capital Investment Act." - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 6, relative to local education capital investment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/22/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee for Review -- Finance, Ways, & Means |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1130 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee