TN HB1171 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 63-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 63-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Firearms Information Privacy Protection Act." - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 77 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 77 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 540 | |
2021-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-07 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, ayes 26, nays 0 |
2021-05-05 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 77, Nays 6, PNV 0 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed. (Bell, Kyle, White) |
2021-05-05 | House | Conf. comm. appointed Reps. Terry, Farmer, Doggett, and Windle. |
2021-05-05 | House | H. refused to recede from its non-concurrence SA 2 |
2021-05-05 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/5/21 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from amendment |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 5/5/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. SA2 HB1171 |
2021-05-04 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar #2 for 5/4/21 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 6 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0385) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0442) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-28 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 74, Nays 19, PNV 1 |
2021-04-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-28 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0266) |
2021-04-28 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0407) |
2021-04-28 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-04-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/28/21 |
2021-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-21 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1142 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 540