TN HB1171 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Def. to First Calendar of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes authority of commission to promulgate rules regulating the commercial lease or rental of non-motorized vessels for non-commercial use by the public on waters of the state. - Amends TCA Title 69 and Title 70.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, removes authority of commission to promulgate rules regulating the commercial lease or rental of non-motorized vessels for non-commercial use by the public on waters of the state. - Amends TCA Title 69 and Title 70.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseDef. to First Calendar of 2020
2019-03-19HouseReset on Final cal. of Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee-- Government Operations Review
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1416 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback