TN HB1171 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Def. to First Calendar of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Def. to First Calendar of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes authority of commission to promulgate rules regulating the commercial lease or rental of non-motorized vessels for non-commercial use by the public on waters of the state. - Amends TCA Title 69 and Title 70.
Title
As introduced, removes authority of commission to promulgate rules regulating the commercial lease or rental of non-motorized vessels for non-commercial use by the public on waters of the state. - Amends TCA Title 69 and Title 70.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Def. to First Calendar of 2020 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee-- Government Operations Review |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1416 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee