TN HB1169 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes the requirement that any applicant for motor vehicle registration who failed to pay wheel tax be responsible for paying for all prior years' wheel taxes, applicable on a statewide basis instead of only applicable in Rutherford County. - Amends TCA Section 55-4-105.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, makes the requirement that any applicant for motor vehicle registration who failed to pay wheel tax be responsible for paying for all prior years' wheel taxes, applicable on a statewide basis instead of only applicable in Rutherford County. - Amends TCA Section 55-4-105.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-07HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-30SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2019-04-30SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0278)
2019-04-30SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-17SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-16HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-15HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 86, Nays 6, PNV 3
2019-04-15HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0168)
2019-04-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
2019-04-09HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/9/2019
2019-04-03HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-03-26HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1335 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-30 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback