TN HB1168 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-11)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 7/1/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-11)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 7/1/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a court from solely considering a parent's disability to determine custody unless it impacts the parent's ability to meet the needs of the child; specifies that a court cannot consider a parent or guardian's disability alone in a termination of parental rights proceeding unless it impacts the physical or psychological welfare of the child. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36 and Title 37, relative to children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective date(s) 7/1/2021 | |
2021-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 235 | |
2021-04-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-30 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-29 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1388 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 235