TN HB1167 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes the provisions of law regarding denial of a driver license or learner's permit to persons under 18 who are not enrolled in and making satisfactory progress in high school. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3017 and Title 55, Chapter 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 49-6-3017 and Title 55, Chapter 50, relative to student driving privileges.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
2023-03-21HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/22/2023
2023-03-08HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
2023-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/8/2023
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1167 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback