TN HB1167 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a court ordering the expunction of a person's public record following discharge to send the order to the Tennessee bureau of investigation in electronic format. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to expunction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1096 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee