TN HB1167 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
Pending: House Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
Pending: House Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the Tennessee state veterans' homes board to name, subject to the governor's approval, the campus, buildings, facilities, and grounds of any state veterans' home; authorizes the administrator of each veterans' home to name any portion of the state veterans' home. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the Tennessee state veterans' homes board to name, subject to the governor's approval, the campus, buildings, facilities, and grounds of any state veterans' home; authorizes the administrator of each veterans' home to name any portion of the state veterans' home. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1145 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee