TN HB1167 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, permits the city of Harriman to raise its occupancy tax from a rate not to exceed 5 percent to a rate not to exceed 7 percent. - Amends Chapter 115 of the Private Acts of 1995.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, permits the city of Harriman to raise its occupancy tax from a rate not to exceed 5 percent to a rate not to exceed 7 percent. - Amends Chapter 115 of the Private Acts of 1995.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 10 | |
2011-04-11 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-04-07 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2011 | |
2011-03-29 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/29/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1193 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-28 - Pr. Ch. 10