TN HB1167 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Deposit Beverage Container Recycling Act". - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 211 and Chapter 86 of the Public Acts of 2005.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Deposit Beverage Container Recycling Act". - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 211 and Chapter 86 of the Public Acts of 2005.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Sponsor change. | |
2009-02-24 | Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to State & Local--Government Operations for review | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1404 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-21 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. E,C&T Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1167&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1167.pdf |