TN HB1166 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a foster care agency to provide a child in foster care with contact information for each sibling who is also in foster care and who is not placed in the same home as the child if maintaining contact with the sibling is in the best interests of each sibling. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 2, Part 4 and Title 37, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, Chapter 2, Part 4 and Title 37, Chapter 5, relative to siblings in foster care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-06-02 | Pub. Ch. 567 | |
2021-05-26 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0376) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-06 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-05 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-05 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0118) |
2021-04-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0644 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 567