TN HB1157 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the governing body of a municipality to publish a notice of meeting for any meeting at which a contract, lease, or lease-purchase agreement entered into between a municipality and a local education agency for the use of real property for educational purposes with a term of at least five years will be considered, at least ten business days before the date set for the meeting. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 12 and Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the governing body of a municipality to publish a notice of meeting for any meeting at which a contract, lease, or lease-purchase agreement entered into between a municipality and a local education agency for the use of real property for educational purposes with a term of at least five years will be considered, at least ten business days before the date set for the meeting. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 12 and Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0581 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback