TN HB1157 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 475
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 475
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises requirements for medical directors and others participating in the operation of a pain management clinic; revises provisions regarding the development of recommended treatment guidelines for prescribing controlled substances; requires the development of recommended pain clinic standards. - Amends TCA Title 63.
Title
As enacted, revises requirements for medical directors and others participating in the operation of a pain management clinic; revises provisions regarding the development of recommended treatment guidelines for prescribing controlled substances; requires the development of recommended pain clinic standards. - Amends TCA Title 63.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Barry Doss [R] | Rep. Mike Stewart [D] | Rep. Bill Dunn [R] |
Rep. Eddie Smith [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
Rep. Curry Todd [R] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] | Rep. Charles Sargent [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] |
Rep. Harry Brooks [R] | Rep. Curtis Johnson [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 475 | |
2015-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/20/15 |
2015-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/8/2015 |
2015-03-31 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1266 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-26 - Pub. Ch. 475
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1157&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1157.pdf |