TN HB1156 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 530
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 530
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, divides the current 21st judicial district into a new 21st district consisting of Williamson County and a new 32nd judicial district consisting of Hickman, Lewis, and Perry counties. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14; Title 8, Chapter 7; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18, Chapter 4 and Title 18, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, divides the current 21st judicial district into a new 21st district consisting of Williamson County and a new 32nd judicial district consisting of Hickman, Lewis, and Perry counties. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14; Title 8, Chapter 7; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18, Chapter 4 and Title 18, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Curcio [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] | Rep. Kirk Haston [R] |
Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 35 N: 42 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 530 | |
2020-02-20 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-02-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/20/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/13/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 2/11/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 2/11/2020 |
2020-01-29 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-22 | House | Ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Re-ref. Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Failed to pass H., Ayes 35, Nays 42, PNV 16 |
2019-04-30 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0347) |
2019-04-30 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0493) |
2019-04-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-03-26 | House | Ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0561 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Pub. Ch. 530