TN HB1152 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 455
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 455
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the state to issue and sell bonds of up to $126 million.
Title
AN ACT to authorize the state of Tennessee, acting by resolutions of its funding board, to issue and sell its bonds and bond anticipation notes to provide for acquisition of equipment and sites, and erection, construction, and equipment of sites and buildings, expressly including the acquisition of existing structures for expansion, improvements, betterments, and extraordinary repairs to existing structures, for construction of highways, and repair, replacement, or rehabilitation of bridges, and for grants to any county, metropolitan government, incorporated town, city, special district of the state, or any governmental agency or instrumentality of any of them; to make grants to industrial development corporations to provide for acquisition of equipment and acquisition, site preparation, erection, construction, and equipment of sites and buildings; and infrastructure improvements and development; and to provide for the expenditure of said funds; to issue its debt in excess of the authorized amount to fund discount and costs of issuance; and to provide for the expenditure of said funds. This act makes appropriations for an indefinite period of time for the purpose of allocating the proceeds of the bonds and notes authorized by this act.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] |
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 455 | |
2021-04-29 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-28 | House | H. Placed on Appropriations Calendar for 4/29/2021 |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/27/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0910 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Effective date(s) 05/17/2021