TN HB1150 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that the fees collected pursuant to the Postsecondary Education Authorization Act be separated from all other collections and expenditures of THEC. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 20.
Title
As introduced, requires that the fees collected pursuant to the Postsecondary Education Authorization Act be separated from all other collections and expenditures of THEC. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 20.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Love [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning |
2016-03-15 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/15/2016 |
2015-03-24 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1178 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1150&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1150.pdf |