TN HB1147 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Failed in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Failed in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that a county judicial commissioner or magistrate may administer the oath of office to an elected or appointed official as authorized by a judge of the court or the county mayor. - Amends TCA Section 8-18-109.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that a county judicial commissioner or magistrate may administer the oath of office to an elected or appointed official as authorized by a judge of the court or the county mayor. - Amends TCA Section 8-18-109.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Failed in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0527 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-25 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee