TN HB1143 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases, from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class E felony, the penalty for a third or subsequent conviction of driving on a license that is canceled, suspended, or revoked. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 55, relative to driver licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-04-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0284 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee