TN HB1140 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 488
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 488
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes the compensation, from an amount not to exceed $1,000 annually to an amount not to exceed $200 monthly, for the board of directors of the Reelfoot Lake regional utility and planning district. - Amends TCA Chapter 222 of the Public Acts of 1983, and any other acts amendatory thereto.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Chapter 222 of the Public Acts of 1983, and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to Reelfoot Lake Regional Utility and Planning District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 488 | |
2021-05-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-28 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1187 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 05/18/2021