TN HB1138 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Taken off notice for cal. in Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-24 - Taken off notice for cal. in Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "West Tennessee River Basin Flood Resiliency Fund Act"; authorizes county mayors to appoint a designee to serve in their place on the authority's board. - Amends TCA Title 64, Chapter 1, Part 11.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 64, Chapter 1, Part 11, relative to the West Tennessee River Basin Authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Tandy Darby [R] |
Rep. Curtis Halford [R] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1189 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee