TN HB1138 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 56-19)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 159
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, exempts from the tax admission, dues, fees, or other charges paid to any person principally engaged in offering services or facilities for the development or preservation of physical fitness through exercise or other active physical fitness conditioning. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 2 and Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, exempts from the tax admission, dues, fees, or other charges paid to any person principally engaged in offering services or facilities for the development or preservation of physical fitness through exercise or other active physical fitness conditioning. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 2 and Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.

Sponsors

Rep. William Lamberth [R]Rep. Ron Gant [R]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]Rep. Mark White [R]
Rep. Mark Cochran [R]Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]
Rep. Lowell Russell [R]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]Rep. Bill Dunn [R]Rep. John Crawford [R]
Rep. Jason Zachary [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Bob Freeman [D]
Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. Chris Todd [R]Rep. Gregory Terry [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]
Rep. Rush Bricken [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]
Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. Rick Staples [D]Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. John Clemmons [D]
Rep. Clay Doggett [R]Rep. London Lamar [D]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]
Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. Karen Camper [D]
Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]Rep. Esther Helton [R]
Rep. G Hardaway [D]Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Jesse Chism [D]
Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]Rep. Pat Marsh [R]
Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. Martin Daniel [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]
Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]
Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]
Rep. John Ragan [R]Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Jason Potts [D]Rep. Bill Beck [D]
Rep. Bill Sanderson [R]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Andy Holt [R]
Rep. Joe Towns [D]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]

Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24 Pub. Ch. 159
2019-04-24 Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
2019-04-15 Signed by Governor.
2019-04-05HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-04-02SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-01HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-01HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-03-28SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 1, PNV 1
2019-03-28SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0168)
2019-03-28SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-03-25SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-03-21HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-03-21HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-03-21HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0070)
2019-03-14HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019
2019-03-12HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/12/2019
2019-03-06HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-27HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0960 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 159

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback