TN HB1138 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 863
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires the board of barber examiners and the state board of cosmetology to issue an authorization to provide postsecondary education in this state to any school registered with the respective board in certain situations; specifies that any person claiming damage or loss as a result of any act or practice by a school or its agent, or both, that is a violation of the laws and rules governing cosmetologists and barbers may file with the board a verified complaint against the school or against its agent, or both. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 1, Part 2 and Title 62.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires the board of barber examiners and the state board of cosmetology to issue an authorization to provide postsecondary education in this state to any school registered with the respective board in certain situations; specifies that any person claiming damage or loss as a result of any act or practice by a school or its agent, or both, that is a violation of the laws and rules governing cosmetologists and barbers may file with the board a verified complaint against the school or against its agent, or both. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 1, Part 2 and Title 62.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-16HouseComp. became Pub. Ch. 863
2014-04-10HouseComp. SB subst.
2014-04-08HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/9/2014
2014-04-03HouseAction Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to Next Calendar
2014-04-02HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/3/2014
2014-03-27HouseAction Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/3/2014
2014-03-26HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/27/2014
2014-03-26HouseRec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2014-03-19HousePlaced on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/26/2014
2014-03-18HouseRec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
2014-03-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/18/2014
2014-03-11HouseAction Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/18/2014
2014-03-05HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/11/2014
2013-02-21HouseAssigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
2013-02-21HouseP2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
2013-02-14HouseIntro., P1C.
2013-02-13HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0760 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 863

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback