TN HB1137 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the state fire marshal to accept an application for a public display of fireworks, regardless of when the application is submitted, and approve the permit for the display if all other permitting and safety requirements are met. - Amends TCA Section 68-104-211.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 68-104-211, relative to fireworks.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
2023-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/21/2023
2023-03-14HouseDef. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Business & Utilities Subcommittee
2023-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/14/2023
2023-02-08HouseAssigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0914 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback