TN HB1136 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c TennCare Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the commissioner to submit to the centers for medicare and medicaid services, within 120 days, a waiver amendment to the TennCare II waiver or new waiver to improve access to and quality of evidence-based home visitation services for the families of babies suffering from neo-natal abstinence syndrome or related conditions. - Amends TCA Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the commissioner to submit to the centers for medicare and medicaid services, within 120 days, a waiver amendment to the TennCare II waiver or new waiver to improve access to and quality of evidence-based home visitation services for the families of babies suffering from neo-natal abstinence syndrome or related conditions. - Amends TCA Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c TennCare Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HouseMeeting Canceled
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-13HouseAction Def. in s/c TennCare Subcommittee to 4/3/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1116 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Deferred to Summer Study

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback