TN HB1135 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, permits advanced practice nurses and physician assistants who are prescribers at community mental health centers to arrange for chart review by and site visits with collaborating physicians by means of HIPAA-compliant electronic information systems. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 19; Title 63, Chapter 6 and Title 63, Chapter 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, permits advanced practice nurses and physician assistants who are prescribers at community mental health centers to arrange for chart review by and site visits with collaborating physicians by means of HIPAA-compliant electronic information systems. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 19; Title 63, Chapter 6 and Title 63, Chapter 7.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2019
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019
2019-03-26HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-05HouseAction Def. in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee to 3/19/2019
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/5/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0972 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Transmitted to Governor for action.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback