TN HB1132 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes certain changes concerning establishment of a veterinarian-client-patient relationship; authorizes continuation of such relationship for up to 24 months, rather than 12 months, in case of livestock. - Amends TCA Title 44; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 44; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to veterinary practice.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1149 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback