TN HB1132 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 447
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 447
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates an exception to provisions concerning the confidentiality of certain investigatory records of the division of health related boards in the department of health. - Amends TCA Title 10; Title 38, Chapter 6 and Title 63, Chapter 1.
Title
As enacted, creates an exception to provisions concerning the confidentiality of certain investigatory records of the division of health related boards in the department of health. - Amends TCA Title 10; Title 38, Chapter 6 and Title 63, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 447 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/22/2019 | |
2019-05-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-15 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-07 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0320) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-15 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0315) |
2019-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019 |
2019-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-03-27 | House | Ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1205 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 447