TN HB1130 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires an LEA to provide for the enrollment of students who are residents of this state, regardless of the student's residence, race, ethnicity, or language proficiency, the resources of the LEA or its schools, or other considerations regarding the appropriateness of a particular school for a particular student; allows a student's parent or legal guardian to appeal an LEA's enrollment or assignment decision for the student to the commissioner of education. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to student enrollment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-28HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
2023-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/28/2023
2023-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/21/2023
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration-- Government Operations for Review
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1419 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-22 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 1

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback