TN HB1130 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes process for three-judge panel hearing civil actions in which the complaint: challenges the constitutionality of a statute, executive order, or rule; includes a claim for declaratory judgment or injunctive relief; and is brought against the state, a state department or agency, or a state official acting in their official capacity. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 16; Title 17; Title 20; Title 27 and Title 29.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2; Title 4; Title 16; Title 17; Title 20; Title 27 and Title 29, relative to causes of action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-06-02 | Pub. Ch. 566 | |
2021-05-26 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-07 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, ayes 27, nays 2 |
2021-05-05 | House | Conf. comm. report (CCR 8) adopted, Ayes 67, Nays 22, PNV 1 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed. (Kelsey, Johnson, Bell, Kyle, Stevens) |
2021-05-05 | House | Conf. comm. appointed. Reps. Farmer, Garrett, Curcio, and Jernigan |
2021-05-05 | House | H. refused to recede from its non-concurrence SA2 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from amendment #2 |
2021-05-05 | House | H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 2 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 6 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0389) |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0451) |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-05-05 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 68, Nays 23, PNV 0 |
2021-05-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-05 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0455) |
2021-05-05 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0384) |
2021-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass if am.; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 4/13/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0868 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 566