TN HB1124 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Action def. in Government Operations Committee to First Calendar of 2020
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Action def. in Government Operations Committee to First Calendar of 2020
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that the board for licensing contractors must promulgate rules in accordance with the Uniform Administrative Procedures Act. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 62 and Title 63.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that the board for licensing contractors must promulgate rules in accordance with the Uniform Administrative Procedures Act. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 62 and Title 63.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to First Calendar of 2020 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1000 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee