TN HB1124 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, includes lineal descendants of original owners of private trust companies among those who may control a private trust. - Amends TCA Section 45-2-2001.
Title
As enacted, includes lineal descendants of original owners of private trust companies among those who may control a private trust. - Amends TCA Section 45-2-2001.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Commerce Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Commerce Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 26 | |
2011-03-21 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-03-17 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2011 | |
2011-03-15 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/15/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 3/9/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Commerce | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0059 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 26