TN HB1119 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits electronic delivery of the annual report of the chief procurement officer on the awarding of purchases to minority-owned, woman-owned, service-disabled-veteran-owned, or small businesses. - Amends TCA Title 12, Chapter 3, Part 11.
Title
As introduced, permits electronic delivery of the annual report of the chief procurement officer on the awarding of purchases to minority-owned, woman-owned, service-disabled-veteran-owned, or small businesses. - Amends TCA Title 12, Chapter 3, Part 11.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Miller [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Rep. JoAnne Favors [D] |
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] | Rep. Rick Staples [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1395 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee