TN HB1114 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires motorboats that carry passengers for hire to be inspected and approved by the Tennessee wildlife resources agency (TWRA); requires operators of motorboats carrying passengers for hire to be licensed by the TWRA; provides requirements for the operation of motorboats carrying passengers for hire. - Amends TCA Title 68; Title 69 and Title 70.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires motorboats that carry passengers for hire to be inspected and approved by the Tennessee wildlife resources agency (TWRA); requires operators of motorboats carrying passengers for hire to be licensed by the TWRA; provides requirements for the operation of motorboats carrying passengers for hire. - Amends TCA Title 68; Title 69 and Title 70.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HouseComp. SB subst.
2018-03-29HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2018
2018-03-28HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018
2018-03-27HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-03-21HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018
2018-03-21HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
2018-03-14HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-03-13HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-07HousePlaced on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/13/2018
2018-03-07HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2018-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
2018-01-31HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2018-01-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 1/31/2018
2017-03-29HouseAction Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 1st Calendar of 2018
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-03-22HouseReset on Final cal. of Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
2017-03-15HouseAction Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/22/2017
2017-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/15/2017
2017-02-15HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2017-02-15HouseP2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2017-02-13HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-13HouseP1C.
2017-02-09HouseIntro.
2017-02-09HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1062 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Transmitted to Governor for action.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback