TN HB1110 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the amount of time any person or entity licensed to provide insurance must respond to the department of commerce and insurance if the department is investigating a complaint against the entity from 30 days to 32 days. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Title
As introduced, increases the amount of time any person or entity licensed to provide insurance must respond to the department of commerce and insurance if the department is investigating a complaint against the entity from 30 days to 32 days. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1168 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1110&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1110.pdf |