TN HB1108 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, repeals requirements that authorization to engage in regulated professions and occupations be revoked for persons who default on student loans; requires reinstatement of licenses for otherwise qualified applicants whose licenses were suspended, denied, or revoked based solely on defaulting on student loan repayment. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 6, Part 3; Title 23, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 1; Title 49; Title 55; Title 56; Title 62 and Title 63.
Title
As introduced, repeals requirements that authorization to engage in regulated professions and occupations be revoked for persons who default on student loans; requires reinstatement of licenses for otherwise qualified applicants whose licenses were suspended, denied, or revoked based solely on defaulting on student loan repayment. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 6, Part 3; Title 23, Chapter 3; Title 38, Chapter 1; Title 49; Title 55; Title 56; Title 62 and Title 63.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-01-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 1/21/2020 |
2019-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business Subcommittee to First Calendar of2020 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0037 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee